MENTAL CALCULATOR EXCELLENT MATHEMATICAL TRICKS

A unique gift is being made by the former teacher to the student world, through which students will be able to solve the questions of mathematics in less time, in this book you will be able to solve the maths questions fast on the calculator. and tricks and techniques are explained.



भूतपूर्व शिक्षक की ओर से छात्र जगत हेतु अनुपम भेंट किया जा रहा है जिसके माध्यम से छात्र कम समय में मैथमेटिक्स के सवालों को सॉल्व करने में सक्षम हो पाएंगे यह पुस्तक में आप सभी लोगों को मैथमेटिक्स के सवालों को केलकुलेटर के तरफ फास्ट सॉल्व करने के तरीके को तथा ट्रिक्स और टेक्निक्स को बतलाई गई है

Mental Calculator Book Pdf

Solving Mathematics questions in less time is very important, but you have to pay attention that solving correctly in less time is more important than that, that’s why in this book, in this book PDF, you will learn the techniques of brain training like a calculator. It has been told through which you will be able to solve fast maths questions even with calculator.

MENTAL CALCULATOR EXCELLENT MATHEMATICAL TRICKS
MENTAL CALCULATOR EXCELLENT MATHEMATICAL TRICKS

मैथमेटिक्स के सवालों को कम समय में सॉल्व करना बहुत जरूरी होता है लेकिन आपको ध्यान देना है कम समय में सही-सही सॉल्व करना उससे भी जरूरी होता है इसीलिए आपको यह पुस्तक में इस पुस्तक पीडीएफ में दिमाग कोई कैलकुलेटर के तरह ट्रेंड करने के टेक्निक्स को बतलाए गए हैं जिसके माध्यम से आप कैलकुलेटर से भी फास्ट मैथमेटिक्स के सवालों को सॉल्व कर पाएंगे

About Mental Calculator Excellent Mathematical Tricks

Book Name Mental calculator
Author Former Teacher
File Size 14 MB
Format PDF
Pages 17
Language English/ Hindi
Publication TopperPoint

Content Mental Mathematical Tricks

Square product of any number and cube and cube root in a row at most places billion trillion square fundamental thousands of years past and future day Aditya method of finding verbally in 10 seconds Along with analysis of many memorable formulas have been given.

किसी भी संख्या का वर्ग गुणनफल तथा घन तथा घनमूल एक पंक्ति में अधिकांश जगह अरब खरब वर्ग मौलिक हजारों वर्ष अतीत एवं भविष्य का दिन 10 सेकंड में मौखिक ज्ञात करने का आदित्य विधि साथ में अनेक चिर स्मरणीय सूत्रों का विश्लेषण दिया गया है

Turn Your Brain Into A Calculator With These Mental Math Tricks

Mental Math Tricks 1

Method of Solving Square of a Thousand Numbers in a Row Like the Square of 534 is 285156 So How Will We Understand It. (एक रोया हजार संख्याओं का वर्ग एक पंक्ति में हल करने की विधि जैसे कि 534 का स्क्वायर 285156 होता है तो यह कैसे होगा हम इसे समझते हैं)

Write the unit of the square of the unit. Write unit times tens times 2 plus gain and in third step write unit times hundred times 2 plus square of tens and in fourth step write unit of tens times ten times * 2 plus gain and then in next step write square of hundreds plus hand if we write it If we explain in a special way, we will know that the square of unit 4 and write the unit times 4 times 3 times 1 times 5 times 4 times 5 times 3 times 5 times 25 achieved 32 will be 285156

इकाई के वर्ग का इकाई लिखें इकाई गुना दहाई गुना 2 प्लस हासिल तथा तीसरे स्टेप में इकाई गुना सैकड़ा गुना 2 प्लस दहाई का वर्ग प्रशासन तथा चौथे स्टेप में दहाई गुनासेकरा * 2 प्लस हासिल का इकाई लिखें और फिर अगले स्टेप में सैकड़ों का वर्ग प्लस हाथ से लिखे हैं अगर हम इसे विशेष तरीके से स्पष्टीकरण करेंगे तो हमें पता चलेगा कि इकाई 4 का वर्ग तथा लिखें हासिल इकाई गुना 4 गुना 3 गुना 1 गुना 5 गुना 4 गुना 5 गुना 3 गुना 5 गुना 25 हासिल  285156 होगा

Mental Math Tricks 2

By the way, the method of finding the square root of numbers, the rules of numbers which are close to 1 to 1000 10000 are as follows, the whole number is as low as one hundred 1000 or 10000 etc., that is, the difference is subtracted, what comes after subtracting it is an integer. Multiply by and add the square of the difference as if to find the square of 99998 then 99998 -2 Equal to 999 996 * 100000 Equal to 9999 becomes 600000 Now 2 square of the number subtracted 4 Added Answer will be 99996 00004.

वैसे संख्याओं का वर्गमूल ज्ञात करने की विधि जो संख्याएं 1 से 1000 10000 के नजदीक हो उनके नियम कुछ इस प्रकार हैं पूर्ण संख्या एक सौ 1000 या 10000 आदि में जितना ही कम हो वही संख्या अर्थात अंतर घटा देते हैं घटाने से जो आता है उसे पूर्णांक से गुणा करें और अंतर का वर्ग जोड़ देते हैं जैसे कि 99998 का स्क्वायर निकालना हो तो 99998 -2 इक्वल टू 9 9 9 9 6 * 100000 इक्वल टू 9999 600000 हो गया अब घटाई गई संख्या का 2 वर्ग 4 जोड़ दिया उत्तर होगा 99996 00004

Mental Math Tricks 3

Some special rules of square like square of 9003 or square of 508 or square of 403 if you want to find out then its rules are as follows square of 9000 plus 3 square bracket off 9000 times 3 times two in the same way 8:00 1000000 plus 9 plus 54000 equal to 8105 4009

वर्ग के कुछ विशेष नियम जैसे 9003 का स्क्वायर या 508 का स्क्वायर या 403 का स्क्वायर अगर निकालना हो तो उसके नियम कुछ इस प्रकार हैं 9000 का स्क्वायर प्लस 3 का स्क्वायर ब्रैकेट बंद 9000 गुना 3 गुना दो उसी तरीका से 8:00 1000000 प्लस 9 प्लस 54000 इक्वल टू 8105 4009

Mental Math Tricks 4

There is a method to find the square root of a three or four digit number whose last digit is five 25 or 75 such as the square of 75 or the square of 95. Its rules are as follows, write the square of the unit and add one to the tenth. Multiply by and write as if the square of 75 would be the square of 5 write 25 and the tens together did a cube 7 plus 1 equal to 8 times the tens * 7 equal to 5 6 2 5 The answer would be we can understand it in this way as If you want to find the square of 625, then some of its rules will be like this, write the square of regular 25 on the right and add the base of Shekhar’s number to the square of Kada’s number and write bye, if the number of Kada is divided by 2 then listen in the middle otherwise write 5 Like the square of 625 is written as 625 of 25, the color of the face, so the square of 6 was 36 and half of 6, that is, 36 plus 3 equal to 390625. The answer would be in the same way if we want to find the square of 1275, then write the square of 75 to the right and Write bye by adding white to the face in the digit prepared from, if the addition is not complete, then complete it and add the square of 75 by adding 5 by listening like 12 The square of 75 is written as 7565. The square of 12 is 11 4 plus 12 equals 18 to 1 6 2 5 6 2 5 The answer will be.

तीन या चार अंक वाली संख्या का वर्गमूल ज्ञात करने के लिए इसकी एक विधि है जिसका अंतिम अंक पांच 25 या 75 हो जैसे कि 75 का स्क्वायर या 95 का स्क्वायर इसके नियम कुछ इस प्रकार हैं इकाई का वर्ग लिख लें और दहाई में एक जोड़कर दहाई से गुणा कर लिख ले जैसे 75 का स्क्वायर होगा 5 का वर्ग 25 लिखें और दहाई साथ में एक घन किया 7 प्लस 1 इक्वल टू 8 गुना दहाई * 7 इक्वल टो 5 6 2 5 उत्तर होगा इसे हम इस प्रकार से समझ सकते हैं जैसे कि 625 का स्क्वायर निकालना हो तो उसके कुछ नियम इस प्रकार से होंगे नियमित 25 का वर्ग दाहिने लिख ले और से कड़े के अंक के वर्ग में शेखरे अंक का आधार जोड़कर बाय लिखें से कड़े का अंक 2 से विभाजित हो तो मध्य में सुनना अन्यथा 5 लिखे जैसे 625 का स्क्वायर यहां 25 का 625 लिखा है चेहरे का रंग तो 6 का वर्ग 36 और 6 का आधा थी अर्थात 36 प्लस 3 इक्वल टू 390625 उत्तर होगा उसी तरीके से अगर हमको 1275 का स्क्वायर निकालना हो तो 75 का वर्ग दाहिने लिख लें और से तैयार के अंक में चेहरे को गोरा जोड़कर बाय लिखें अगर जोड़ा किया हुआ पूरा नहीं हो तो उसे पूर्ण करके जोड़ दो 75 का वर्ग को बाय 5 मिलाकर सुनने जैसे 1275 का स्क्वायर 7565 लिखा 12 का वर्ग 11 4 प्लस 12 का 18 इक्वल टू 1 6 2 5 6 2 5 उत्तर होगा

Mental Math Tricks 5

In the age of electronic and computer, students must be aware of the latest information about numerology. The rules for plus 5 plus 7 plus 9 will be added in such a way that if you want to add odd numbers from one to the last number, do a cube in the last number and divide its square by 4 like 9 plus 1 equal to 10 square 1 100 divided by 84 equal to 25 would be the answer.

इलेक्ट्रॉनिक व कंप्यूटर के युग में छात्रों को अंक विज्ञान की नवीनतम जानकारी से अवगत होना ही चाहिए सम विषम लगातार संख्याओं का योगफल खेल के मैदान में मौखिक ज्ञात करने की विधि जरूर पता होनी चाहिए विषम संख्याओं का योगफल ज्ञात करने की विधि जैसे कि 1 प्लस 3 प्लस 5 प्लस 7 प्लस 9 को नियम इस प्रकार से जुड़ेंगे एक से जितने तक विषम संख्याओं को जोड़ना हो तो अंतिम संख्या में एक घन करें और उसके वर्ग में 4 का भाग दें जैसे 9 प्लस 1 इक्वल टू 10 का वर्ग 1 100 भाग 84 इक्वल टू 25 उत्तर होगा

Mental Math Tricks 6

If you want to add consecutive even odd or any mountains, then its rules are as follows, divide the first number plus the last number like 8 plus 16 plus 24 plus 32 i.e. four times so 4 times 8 plus 32 over 2 equal to 4 times 40 part will be 82 equal to 80 and in this way we can understand how we will be able to add it and we will be able to write mountains through trick.

लगातार सम विषम या किसी पहाड़ों को जोड़ना हो तो उसके नियम इस प्रकार से हैं उतना ही गुनाह पहली संख्या प्लस अंतिम संख्या भागा दो जैसे कि 8 प्लस 16 प्लस 24 प्लस 32 यानी चार बार इसलिए 4 गुना 8 प्लस 32 बटा 2 इक्वल टू 4 गुना 40 भाग 82 इक्वल टू 80 होगा और इस प्रकार से हम यह समझ पाए कि किस प्रकार से हम इसे जोड़ पाएंगे और हम पहाड़ों को ट्रिक के माध्यम से लिख पाएंगे.

Mental Math Tricks 7

The rules for multiplying a two or three digit number whose unit’s digit is 5 are as follows: Write the square of the unit on the right and write the left by adding half of the sum of the two medicines in tens times tens such as 95 times 75 equal to the square of the units. Write 25 to the right and write tens times tens i.e. 9 times 7 equal to 63, divide the sum of both tens by 9 plus 7 which will be eight and thus the answer will be 7125, here you have to pay attention that if the sum of both the tens is 2 If not divided by 5, then add five to the tens of the answer like a 45 * 35, in this, the product of both the units has 8 pairs and the answer is 2 to 5 pairs, the answer will be 5075 in the same way we should understand this.

दो या तीन अंक वाली संख्या का गुणनफल हर करना जिसका इकाई का अंक 5 हो उसके नियम कुछ इस प्रकार हैं इकाई का वर्ग दाहिने लिखो और दहाई गुना दहाई में दोनों दवाइयों के योग का आधा जोड़कर बाय लिखें जैसे 95 गुना 75 इक्वल टू इकाई का वर्ग 25 दाहिने लिखें और दहाई गुना दहाई अर्थात 9 गुना 7 इक्वल टू 63 लिखें दोनों दहाई के योग का आधा 9 प्लस 7 भागा दो करें जो आठ आएगा और इस प्रकार से उत्तर 7125 होगा यहां पर आपको ध्यान देना है कि अगर दोनों दहाई का योगफल 2 से विभाजित नहीं हो तो उत्तर की दहाई में पांच जोड़ देते हैं जैसे एक 45 * 35 इसमें दोनों इकाई के गुणनफल में 8 जोड़ी है और उत्तर की दवाई 2 से 5 जोड़ी है इसका उत्तर होगा 5075 उसी प्रकार से हमें यह समझना चाहिए

Mental Math Tricks 8

In the world of electronic or computer, computer has also got entangled in the confusion of numbers since January 1, 2000, but through mathematical formulas, the method of finding the date and day from the date of any union is very easy, whose rules are as follows. sant plus 74 plus date divide by 7 in the sum of the special rule special rule January 1st May 2nd September 6th February 4th June 5th October 1st March 4th July 2nd November 4th April 4th August 3rd December 6 Note You have to note that the doubt is only of tens digit tens digit only quarter of pune date write the month number eg what day was 8th january 1970 70 plus 17 plus date 8 special rule 1 equal to 96 sum divided remainder will be from 1 to 6:00 sunday one monday two Tue three Wednesday four Thursday four Friday four Saturday zero one note to pay attention, if not pay attention, in January 4 February, special amendment has to be made for 3 pairs of centenary from January 1, 2000 to December 31, 2099, do 1 minute before dividing the sum by 7 and find out the day in advance.

इलेक्ट्रॉनिक या और कंप्यूटर की दुनिया में एक जनवरी 2000 से अंको की उलझन में कंप्यूटर भी उलझ गया है किंतु गणितीय सूत्रों के माध्यम से किसी भी संघ की तिथि से दिन तथा दिन से तारीख मालूम करने की विधि बहुत आसान है जिसके नियम इस प्रकार से हैं संत प्लस 74 प्लस तारीख विशेष नियम के योगफल में 7 का भाग दे विशेष नियम जनवरी 1 मई 2 सितंबर 6 फरवरी 4 जून 5 अक्टूबर 1 मार्च 4 जुलाई 2 नवंबर 4 अप्रैल 4 अगस्त 3 दिसंबर 6 नोट आपको यह ध्यान देना है शंका केवल दहाई का अंक दहाई का अंक का केवल चौथाई पुणे के तारीख लिखकर महीना वाली संख्या लिखिए जैसे 8 जनवरी 1970 को कौन सा दिन था 70 प्लस 17 प्लस तारीख 8 विशेष नियम 1 इक्वल टू 96 योगफल भागा अवशेष 1 से 6:00 तक होगा रविवार एक सोमवार दो मंगल तीन बुधवार चार बृहस्पतिवार चार शुक्रवार चार शनिवार जीरो एक नोट ध्यान देना है न होने पर जनवरी में 4 फरवरी में 3 जोड़े शताब्दी हेतु विशेष संशोधन करना है 1 जनवरी 2000 से 31 दिसंबर 2099 तक योगफल में 7 से भाग देने से पूर्व 1 मिनट करें एवं पूर्व से इसमें दिन मालूम करें

Mental Math Tricks 9

The rules for multiplying a number by a number that does not have every digit are as follows * 1 – and the number that comes from subtracting from the times subtract from the number and get the product eg 525 times 999 – 1 – 524 52447 point 5 will be.

किसी संख्या की ऐसी गुणांक संख्या से गुणा करना जिसका प्रत्येक अंक ना हो उसे नियम कुछ इस प्रकार से हैं * में से 1 – और घटाने से जो संख्या आती है गुना में से घटाओ और गुणनफल प्राप्त करो जैसे 525 गुना 999 – 1 – 524 52447 पॉइंट 5 होगा

Mental Math Tricks 10

There is a close relationship between mathematics and geometry. Here find the number of siblings through Ganesha pictures whose rules are as follows: Mother plus father plus brother Yoga * 2 plus 12 * 5 plus the sum plus 25 – A unit’s digit sister tens digit brother.

गणित और ज्यामिति में घनिष्ठ संबंध है यहां गणेश चित्रों के माध्यम से भाई-बहन की संख्या ज्ञात करें जिसके नियम कुछ इस प्रकार से हैं माता प्लस पिता प्लस भाई योग * 2 प्लस 12 * 5 प्लस वहीं योगफल से 25 – ए इकाई का अंक बहिन दहाई का अंक भाई

Mental Math Tricks 11

In view of the following numbers, sports numbers make the complex world of mathematics even more interesting 500 5000 Tell a number that is divisible by 7 11 13, their answer is 59 seconds two times in a row, then you will find its answer in this way 3 digits Write any number in parallel twice that which is a perfect divisible number of digits is an irrefutable true such as 315 315 84 2842 Square Equal of 107 Square Equal to 1 1 4 9 109 Square Equal to 11 881 206 Square Equal to 42-43 Add units to the original number and write the square of the right unit 107 plus 7 equals to 11449

निम्नांकित अंकों के मद्देनजर क्रीडा अंक गणित के जटिल दुनिया को और भी रोचक बना देती है 500 5000 ऐसी संख्या बताओ जो 7 11 13 से पूर्ण विभाजित हो उनके उत्तर एक पंक्ति में दो समय 59 सेकंड है तो आप इसके उत्तर इस प्रकार से निकालेंगे 3 अंकों की किसी भी संख्या को समानांतर दो बार लिखिए वो जो अंको की संख्या पूर्ण विभाजित है अकाट्य सत्य है जैसे कि 315 315 84 2842 107 का स्क्वायर इक्वल टू 1 1 4 9 109 का स्क्वायर इक्वल टू 11 881 206 का स्क्वायर इक्वल टू 42-43 मूल संख्या में इकाई जोड़िए और दाहिने इकाई का वर्ग लिखो 107 प्लस 7 इक्वल टू 11449

Some General Rules to Solve Mathematics Questions

  • Square of 34 1156 Square of 254 64516 The rule to calculate it is like this: Write the tens unit of the work of the unit, keep the remainder in hand by writing the unit times 10 times 2 plus c, keep it together now from tens times tens times Write special attention or pay attention in 34 unit 4 cover 16 unit of 16 which is written achieved is in one hand now unit 4 * tens 3 times 2 equal to 24 plus 1 equal to 25 of 5 write achieve hold in two hands Daha Daha Equal to 9 plus 2 Equal to 11 Answer will be.
  • 34 का स्क्वायर 1156 254 का स्क्वायर 64516 इसके निकालने के कुछ इस प्रकार से नियम है इकाई के वर्क का दहाई इकाई लिखें शेष हाथ में रख ले इकाई गुना 10 गुना 2 प्लस सी का इकाई लिखने से साथ में रख ले अब दहाई गुना दहाई गुना से लिखें विशेष तरीके से ध्यान या देना है 34 में इकाई 4 कवर 16 का इकाई जो लिखा गया है हासिल एक हाथ में है अब इकाई 4 * दहाई 3 गुना 2 इक्वल टू 24 प्लस 1 इक्वल टू 25 का 5 लिखें हासिल दो हाथ में रख ले दहा दहा इक्वल टू 9 प्लस 2 इक्वल टू 11 आंसर होगा
  • Tell the even and odd numbers in the fist, ask a partner to keep even and odd numbers in both the fists, find the sum by multiplying by five in the right and 6 in the left, if there is time, then the number of the right hand will be less then the sum is odd then the right hand Number of numbers will be odd like in right hand 8 times 5 equal to 40 in left hand 9 times 6 equal to 5494 sum is even so right hand number will be less
  • मुट्ठी में सम और विषम संख्या बताओ किसी साथी के दोनों मुट्ठी में सम और विषम संख्या रखने को कहो दाहिने में पांच और बाएं में 6 से गुणा कराकर योगफल ज्ञात कर लो अगर समय है तो दाहिने हाथ की संख्या कम होगी योग विषम है तो दाहिने हाथ की संख्या विषम होगी जैसे दाहिने हाथ में 8 गुना 5 इक्वल टू 40 बाएं हाथ में 9 गुना 6 इक्वल टू 5494 योगफल सम है अतः दाहिने हाथ की संख्या कम होगी

How to solve math’s questions correctly in the shortest time

Simple questions also become complicated with special competition and special oral exam. Find the square mean of consecutive numbers having same number of marks rather answer in 5 seconds like square of 11 121 square of 10111 12321 rule is as follows how many marks are in counting Write the count till the last digit add up the rest count reverse Jay Square of 36 1089 Square of 333 Rule 11089 Rule of last 3 Write the square of the last 3 Write the number of digits left in the count Write as many 8 as count by listening in the middle Write it as square of 66 4356 666 355 Write 5 in as many counts as written and write in count.

विशेष प्रतियोगिता एवं विशेष मौखिक परीक्षा के साथ साधारण प्रश्न भी जटिल हो जाते हैं लगातार समान अंक वाली संख्याओं का वर्ग माध्य ज्ञात करें बल्कि 5 सेकंड में उत्तर दें जैसे कि 11 का स्क्वायर 121 10111 का स्क्वायर 12321 नियम इस प्रकार हैं गिनती में जितने अंक हैं क्रम से वह तक गिनती लिखिए अंतिम अंक जोड़कर शेष गिनती उल्टी लिखें जय 36 का स्क्वायर 1089 333 का स्क्वायर 11089 नियम अंतिम 3 का वर्ग लिखें शेष गिनती में जितने उन्हें लिखने अंक बचे हैं गिनती में उतने ही 8 लिखें मध्य में सुन लिखकर गिनती में उतने ही लिखें जैसे 66 का स्क्वायर 4356 666 355 नियम को लिखे गए उतने गिनती में 5 लिखे लिखे एवं गिनती में लिखें

Some difficult maths questions and their simple solutions

If the converse is subtracted from any three digit number, then the middle digit will not always change automatically and the difference between the digit of the unit’s digit and the number of shekra will remain.

तीन अंको की किसी भी संख्या से विलोम घटाया जाएगा तो बीच का अंक सदा आप परिवर्तित ना ही होगा और इकाई का अंक दहाई और शेकड़ा का अंक का अंतर ही रहेगा

Easy way to solve maths and science maths questions

Ankur is a mixed game of numbers, maths and science, the game of both is a game of regular and difficult discipline, if students follow the discipline, then the complex problems of mathematics will be overcome, yet tell the number or the age of a partner, if you want to know the rules then We can solve it by ourselves present age plus next year age * 5 * fruit plus multiple of birth year -5 Now only number made of tens and second digits will give specified age like let’s say age of Ko is 16 and birth year is 1974 Current age is 16 and next year age is 17 years 16 plus 17 equal to 33 times 5 plus 165 plus.

अंकुर संख्याओं का मिश्रित खेल ही गणित है और विज्ञान है दोनों का खेल नियमित एवं कठिन अनुशासन का खेल है छात्र गन भी अनुशासन का पालन करेंगे तो गणित के जटिल समस्याएं दूर होगी फिर भी संख्या या किसी साथी की आयु बताओ कि अगर नियम जानने हैं तो हम इसे खुद से सॉल्व कर सकते हैं वर्तमान आयु प्लस अगले वर्ष की आयु * 5 * फल प्लस जन्म वर्ष की कई -5 अब दहाई और सेकरी अंकों से बनी संख्या ही निर्दिष्ट आयु बताएगी जैसे मान लीजिए कि को की आयु 16 और जन्म वर्ष 1974 है वर्तमान आयु 16 और अगले वर्ष की आयु 17 वर्ष 16 प्लस 17 इक्वल टू 33 गुना 5 प्लस 165 प्लस जंक्शन की कार


Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *

error: